Jason Alles resumes & CV records
Resumes
General Manager And Partner
General Manager and Partner Justfitness 4U Oct 1, 2013 - Dec 1, 2014
Vice President Infinity Digital Marketing Group Oct 1, 2013 - Dec 1, 2014
Founder and Chief Strategist Solution Marketing Dec 2012 - Oct 2013
Executive Director of Digital Marketing Send Out Cards Dec 2012 - Oct 2013
Distritbutor Golds Gym of Georgia Nov 2004 - May 2007
Director of Operations and Area Supervisor Cnf Nov 2004 - May 2007
President and Chief Executive Officer 24 Hour Fitness Sep 1, 2001 - Oct 1, 2003
Do It All Sportslife Fitness Jun 1986 - Oct 1999
General Manager
School of Hard Knocks, the University of Life
Capuchino High School
Basketball
Reading
Regional Sales Manager
Regional Sales Manager Medline Industries, Inc.
Account Manager Kansas City Millwork Jan 2001 - Jan 2014
Purchasing
Bachelors, Bachelor of Arts, Psychology Winterset Senior High School
Owner, In Balance
Owner, In Balance
Jason Alles
President
Jason Alles
Manager Left Standing, Senior Technician At Ibew Local 357
Manager Fisk Technologies - Las Vegas, Nevada Area Feb 2007 - Dec 2009
Senior Tech Effecient Electric Jan 2000 - Jan 2007
Foreman/Sales Centurion Integrated Systems - Las Vegas Jan 1998 - Jan 2000
Tech
Associates, Computer Electronics Clark High School 1986 - 1988
Owner, Cnf Inc.
Owner
Jason Alles - Woodstock, GA
Vice President Global Fitness Association Jan 2011 to Oct 2013
Vice President of Marketing Source 4Fitness - Woodstock, GA Jan 2007 to Jan 2011
Owner/Operator Gold's Gym - Atlanta, GA Oct 2002 to Oct 2004
Executive Director of Operations Sportslife - Atlanta, GA Jun 1985 to Apr 2000
Operations/Sales/Sales Manager/General Manager