Kurt Kuyper resumes & CV records
Resumes
President
President Wks Restaurant Group
Vice President of Operations, Krispy Kreme Doughnuts Rita's Italian Ice Nov 2013 - Jan 2016
Managing Director - Rita's San Diego, Lp and Rita's Inland Empire, Lp El Pollo Loco Nov 2011 - Oct 2013
Director of Operations Empire Education Group Nov 1, 2008 - Mar 1, 2011
Regional Director Westward Dough Mar 1, 2007 - Jan 1, 2009
Director - Strategic Planning, Operations Food Fun 2005 - 2007
Chief Operations Officer Krispy Kreme Oct 1, 1998 - Oct 1, 2005
Division Director - West Krispy Kreme Australia Jan 1, 2004 - Jul 1, 2005
Director - Operations Claremont Mckenna College 1982 - 1986
Graduate Franklin University Switzerland 1985 - 1985
Student
Master of Business Administration, Masters, Real Estate, Marketing Claremont Mckenna College 1982 - 1986
Bachelors, Bachelor of Arts, Management Franklin University Switzerland 1985 - 1985
Franklin College Switzerland 1985 - 1985
Iolani School 1970 - 1982
Uc Irvine