Marc Church resumes & CV records
Resumes
Operations Officer
Operations Officer Special Operations Command North
Deputy Director of Operations Air University Jul 2016 - Jun 2017
School of Advanced Air and Space Studies Student Special Operations Command-North Jul 2016 - Jun 2017
Strategic Planner Usaf Air Command and Staff College Jul 2016 - Jun 2017
Acsc Student 27Th Special Operations Wing Jan 1, 2014 - Jul 2015
Executive Officer United States Air Force Jan 2013 - Jan 2014
Assistant Operations Officer 73 Expeditionary Special Operations Squadron Sep 2013 - Dec 2013
Commander United States Air Force Jul 2011 - Jan 2013
Flight Commander Air Force Special Operations Command Jun 2009 - Jul 2011
Chief Ac-130 Weapons and Tactics United States Air Force Mar 2008 - Jun 2009
Executive Officer United States Air Force Mar 2007 - Mar 2008
Resource Advisor United States Air Force Mar 2006 - Mar 2007
Chief, Small Computers
Masters, Philosophy Community College of the Air Force 2015 - 2016
Masters, Art Air Command and Staff College 2015 - 2016
Masters, Art Air Command and Staff College Jan 1, 2012 - 2012
Usaf Weapons School Jan 1, 2009 - Dec 31, 2009
Squadron Officers School Jan 1, 2009 - Dec 31, 2009
University of Arkansas Jan 1, 2005 - 2008
Master of Science, Masters, Operations Management Brigham Young University Jan 1, 1996 - 2002
Bachelors, Bachelor of Arts, Political Science Panama Canal College Jan 1, 1995 - Dec 31, 1996