Micah Wood resumes & CV records
Resumes
Planning Director
Location:
Nashville, TN
Industry:
Civil Engineering
Work:
Town of Thompson's Station
Planning Director Volkert, Inc.
Planning and Environmental Manager City of Franklin Tennessee Jan 1, 2014 - Jan 1, 2015
City Planner Volkert, Inc. Jan 1, 2014 - Jan 1, 2015
Senior Planner City of Franklin Tennessee Nov 1, 2007 - Jan 1, 2014
Current Planing Supervisor City of Franklin Tennessee Sep 1, 2006 - Nov 1, 2007
Principal Planner State of Tennessee Jun 2004 - Sep 2006
Principal Planner
Planning Director Volkert, Inc.
Planning and Environmental Manager City of Franklin Tennessee Jan 1, 2014 - Jan 1, 2015
City Planner Volkert, Inc. Jan 1, 2014 - Jan 1, 2015
Senior Planner City of Franklin Tennessee Nov 1, 2007 - Jan 1, 2014
Current Planing Supervisor City of Franklin Tennessee Sep 1, 2006 - Nov 1, 2007
Principal Planner State of Tennessee Jun 2004 - Sep 2006
Principal Planner
Education:
University of Tennessee, Knoxville 2002 - 2004
Master of Science, Masters, Regional Planning University of Tennessee, Knoxville 1998 - 2002
Bachelors, Bachelor of Science, Political Science Shelbyville Central High School 1994 - 1998
Master of Science, Masters, Regional Planning University of Tennessee, Knoxville 1998 - 2002
Bachelors, Bachelor of Science, Political Science Shelbyville Central High School 1994 - 1998
Skills:
Economic Development, Land Use Planning, Zoning, Land Use, Urban Planning, Subdivisions, Regional Planning, Sustainability, Site Plans, Gis, Comprehensive Planning, Policy, Parks, Grant Writing, Environmental Awareness, Project Planning, Environmental Planning, Public Policy
Certifications:
Aicp
American Institute of Certified Planners (Aicp)
American Institute of Certified Planners (Aicp)
Micah Wood
Micah Wood
Micah Wood
Work:
Tmc
Skills:
Microsoft Office
Code Wrangler At Newclarity Llc
Position:
Code Wrangler at NewClarity LLC, Owner / CEO at Order of Business, LLC
Location:
Snellville, Georgia
Industry:
Internet
Work:
NewClarity LLC
- Greater Atlanta Area since Apr 2011
Code Wrangler Order of Business, LLC since Jan 2009
Owner / CEO
Code Wrangler Order of Business, LLC since Jan 2009
Owner / CEO
Education:
Georgia State University - J. Mack Robinson College of Business 2000 - 2002
B.B.A., Management and Marketing
B.B.A., Management and Marketing
Skills:
Social Media, PHP, MySQL, JavaScrpt, jQuery, WordPress, Git, Mercurial, Subversion, SEO, Marketing, HTML, CSS, Small Business, Public Speaking, Social Media Marketing, Entrepreneurship, Wordpress
Interests:
Martial arts, disc golf, WordPress
Honor & Awards:
Martial Arts Training:
Instructor and Black Belt in American Style Karate, Brown Belt in Modern Arnis and Kenpo Karate, White Belt with three stripes in Brazilian Jiu-Jitsu