Paul Goudreault resumes & CV records
Resumes
Founding Partner
Founding Partner Wood
Oil and Gas Sector Leader Amec Foster Wheeler Jan 2012 - Oct 2017
Global E and I Oil and Gas Sector Leader Kinnickinnic River Land Trust Dec 1, 2009 - May 1, 2014
Board Member Energy Concepts Aug 2009 - Feb 2011
Advisory Board Member Designer Doors Jan 1, 2010 - Jan 1, 2011
Chief Executive Officer and President Wipfli Llp Nov 2010 - Jan 2011
Business Advisory Board Gtsc, Inc. Jan 2004 - Aug 2010
Chairman Delta Consultants Jan 1, 2009 - Jan 1, 2010
Managing Director Inogen Environmental Alliance Inc Nov 2008 - Jan 2010
Board Director Inogen Environmental Alliance Inc Jan 2002 - Oct 2008
Chairman Delta Consultants Feb 1999 - Apr 2007
Chief Executive Officer Kinnickinnic River Land Trust Jun 2003 - May 2005
Supervisor University of Wisconsin-River Falls Sep 2000 - May 2001
Adjunct Professor Delta Consultants Jan 1995 - Jan 1999
Vice President Minnesota Environmental Initiative Jan 1990 - Apr 1995
Founding Board Member Delta Consultants Sep 1986 - Dec 1994
Consultant Minnesota Polution Control Agency May 1984 - Sep 1986
Senior Hydrogeologist
Master of Science, Masters Western Michigan University 1978 - 1980
Bachelors, Bachelor of Science, Geology Olivet College 1977 - 1978
Bachelors, Bachelor of Science, Geology Olivet High School