Stuart Ohleyer resumes & CV records
Resumes
President At Hotplate
President Union Street Partners Aug 2001 - Sep 2008
Partner, Director of Client Services Frierson Mee & Partners Sep 1993 - Aug 2001
Partner, Director of Client Services Alcone Marketing Group Apr 1990 - Aug 1993
VP Account Director Ally & Gargano Nov 1987 - Mar 1990
VP Account Supervisor Ogilvy & Mather Promotions Jan 1985 - Nov 1987
Account Executive
Bachelor's, Marketing
Strategic Marketing Communications
Strategic Marketing Communications The Church and Schools of St Dominic
Director of Marketing and Communications Tiger Nuts Usa and Others Jul 2016 - Oct 2017
Strategic Marketing Consultant The Ideal School & Academy Jul 1, 2015 - Jun 2016
Director of Marketing and Communication Brooklyn Heights Montessori School Dec 31, 2013 - Dec 31, 2015
Director of Marketing and Communications Brooklyn Heights Montessori School Dec 31, 2010 - Dec 31, 2014
Director of Institutional Advancement Hotplate Sep 2001 - Aug 2011
President and Director of Business Development + Client Services Frierson Mee and Partners Sep 1999 - Aug 2001
Partner and General Manager Frierson Mee & Partners Sep 1993 - Aug 1999
Partner, Director of Client Services Alcone Marketing Group Apr 1990 - Aug 1993
Vice-President, Account Director and Executive Committee Member
Bachelors, Bachelor of Science Indiana University - Kelley School of Business
Bachelors, Marketing