Location:
124 Perquimans Dr, Raleigh, NC 27609
Industry:
Health, Wellness And Fitness
Work:
Omnysense
Strategic Board of Advisors
Mindcare Solutions Group, Inc.
Oct 2013 - Apr 2019
Secretary of the Board of Directors
Digital Health Institute For Transformation (Dhit)
Sep 2017 - Feb 2018
Co-Founder, Secretary Board of Directors
American Telemedicine Association
Sep 2017 - Feb 2018
Chair-Elect of the Telemental Health Sig
Vital Health Network
Jan 1, 2006 - Mar 2016
Chief Executive Officer
In-Kind Friends
Jan 1, 2006 - Mar 2016
Chair of the Board and Founding Member
Medical Web
Mar 1, 1998 - Nov 1, 2014
Chief Executive Officer
Virtual Medical Group
Mar 1, 1998 - Nov 2014
Chief Executive Officer
Montessori School of Raleigh
Mar 1, 1998 - Nov 2014
Chair on Committee of Trustees, Executive Committee, Board of Trustees
Cope
Jan 1, 2006 - Oct 1, 2013
Cope Was Acquired By Mindcare Solutions Group
Dagny Diversified
Jan 1, 2006 - Oct 1, 2013
Ceo, Investor, Executive Advisor
Dagny Diversified
Jan 1, 2006 - Oct 1, 2013
Chief Executive Officer
Pwc
Jan 1997 - Apr 1999
Senior Consultant
Master Health Plan
1996 - 1997
Vice President of Legal and Regulatory Affairs
Georgia Office of State Administrative Hearings
1995 - 1996
Adminstrative Law Judge
Education:
Georgia State University College of Law 1989 - 1992
Doctor of Jurisprudence, Doctorates, Law
University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill 1985 - 1989
Bachelors, Bachelor of Arts, Business, Political Science
Skills:
Behavioral Health, Healthcare, Leadership, Health, Coaching, Entrepreneurship, Healthcare Information Technology, Healthcare Industry, Law, Regulatory Affairs